Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José María Ortega Trinidad

Prelate Emeritus of Juli, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Dec 1950 Born
25 Jun 197827.4Ordained PriestPriest of Yauyos, Peru
22 Apr 200655.3AppointedPrelate of Juli, Peru
1 Jul 200655.5Ordained BishopPrelate of Juli, Peru
15 Nov 201867.8ResignedPrelate of Juli, Peru

MicroData Summary for José María Ortega Trinidad
Bishop José María Ortega Trinidad (born ) Prelate Emeritus of Juli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNava
Ordained BishopMadre del Amor Hermoso, San Vicente de Cañete

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of Juli.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Apr 2006
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,201
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 15 Nov 2018

Quantcast