Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jaime Rodríguez Salazar, M.C.C.I.

Bishop of Huánuco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1939 BornLa Luz, México
9 Sep 196526.2ProfessedMember of Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus
3 Jul 196627.1Ordained PriestPriest of Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus
16 Dec 200465.5AppointedBishop of Huánuco, Peru
3 Apr 200565.8Ordained BishopBishop of Huánuco, Peru

MicroData Summary for Jaime Rodríguez Salazar:
Bishop Jaime Rodríguez Salazar M.C.C.I. (born ) Bishop of Huánuco

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Huánuco.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 179, Number 14,846

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013