Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco González Hernández, O.P.

Vicar Apostolic of Puerto Maldonado

Titular Bishop of Thuccabora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1952 BornCastronuño, Spain
18 Dec 198230.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
15 May 200148.8AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Puerto Maldonado, Peru
15 May 200148.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Thuccabora
8 Jul 200149.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thuccabora
2 Feb 200855.5SucceededVicar Apostolic of Puerto Maldonado, Peru

MicroData Summary for Francisco González Hernández:
Bishop Francisco González Hernández O.P. (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Puerto Maldonado

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Puerto Maldonado.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • s: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Number 14,004

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 2 Sep 2014