Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michał Blecharczyk

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Tarnów, Poland

Titular Bishop of Ios


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Aug 1905Born
26 Mar 193226.5Ordained PriestPriest of Tarnów, Poland
6 Jul 195852.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tarnów, Poland
6 Jul 195852.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Ios
5 Oct 195853.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ios
10 Nov 196560.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Tarnów, Poland

MicroData Summary for Michał Blecharczyk
Bishop Michał Blecharczyk (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Tarnów

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRabie Niżna

  • a priest for 33.6 years
  • a bishop for 7.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Website of the Diocese, 20 May 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast