Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karol Pękala

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Tarnów

Titular Bishop of Trocmades


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1902BornSiołkowej
29 Jun 192825.7Ordained PriestPriest of Tarnów, Poland
14 Dec 194644.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tarnów, Poland
14 Dec 194644.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Trocmades
16 Mar 194744.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Trocmades
14 Aug 196865.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Tarnów, Poland

MicroData Summary for Karol Pękala:
Bishop Karol Pękala (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Tarnów

  • a priest for 40.1 years
  • a bishop for 21.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,873
  • b: Website of the Diocese, 20 May 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,819
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013