Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Józef Gucwa

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Tarnów, Poland

Titular Bishop of Vaga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1923Born
29 Jun 194824.5Ordained PriestPriest of Tarnów, Poland
21 Dec 196845.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tarnów, Poland
21 Dec 196845.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Vaga
26 Jan 196945.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vaga
11 Dec 199975.9RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Tarnów, Poland
8 Mar 200480.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Tarnów, Poland

MicroData Summary for Józef Gucwa (VIAF: 162616070)
Bishop Józef Gucwa (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Tarnów

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKąclowa
Ordained BishopSainte-Marguerite, Church, Nowy Sacz

  • a priest for 55.6 years
  • a bishop for 35.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 5, Number 245

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 7 Mar 2019

Quantcast