Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Nguyễn Bnh Tinh, P.S.S. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ð Nẵng, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1930Born
31 May 196029.9Ordained PriestPriest of Kontum, Viet Nam
13 Jun 196130.9ProfessedPriest of Society of Priests of Saint Sulpice
10 May 200069.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Ð Nẵng, Viet Nam
30 Jun 200070.0Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Ð Nẵng, Viet Nam
6 Nov 200070.3SucceededBishop of Ð Nẵng, Viet Nam
13 May 200675.8RetiredBishop of Ð Nẵng, Viet Nam
21 Nov 202393.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Ð Nẵng, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Paul Nguyễn Bnh Tinh
(WikiData: Q2061476)
Bishop Paul Nguyễn Bnh Tinh P.S.S. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ð Nẵng

EventPlace
Birth PlacePht Diệm, Vicariate Apostolic of Pht Dim
Ordained BishopNear, Cathedral, Ð Nẵng, Diocese of Ð Nẵng

  • a priest for 63.4 years
  • a bishop for 23.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 13 May 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Number 13,803

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024