Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Trn Thanh Chung

Bishop Emeritus of Kontum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1927 Born Nang
25 May 195527.5Ordained PriestPriest
26 Mar 198153.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Kontum, Viet Nam
22 Nov 198154.0Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Kontum, Viet Nam
8 Apr 199567.4SucceededBishop of Kontum, Viet Nam
16 Jul 200375.7RetiredBishop of Kontum, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Pierre Trn Thanh Chung:
Bishop Pierre Trn Thanh Chung (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Kontum

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kontum.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134, Number 12,044

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013