Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simon Hoa Nguyên-van Hien

Deceased

Bishop of Đà Lạt, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1906Born
21 Dec 193529.7Ordained PriestPriest
20 Sep 195549.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Saigon, Viet Nam
20 Sep 195549.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Sagalassus
30 Nov 195549.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sagalassus
24 Nov 196054.6AppointedBishop of Đà Lạt, Viet Nam
5 Sep 197367.4DiedBishop of Đà Lạt, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Simon Hoa Nguyên-van Hien
Bishop Simon Hoa Nguyên-van Hien (born , died ) Bishop of Đà Lạt

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNhu Ly, Quangtri

  • a priest for 37.7 years
  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 108
  • bd: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1973, Page 150

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 17 Nov 2018

Quantcast