Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François Xavier Lê Văn Hồng

Archbishop Emeritus of Huế, Viet Nam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1940 Born
21 Dec 196929.4Ordained PriestPriest of Huế, Viet Nam
19 Feb 200564.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Huế, Viet Nam
19 Feb 200564.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Gadiaufala
7 Apr 200564.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gadiaufala
18 Aug 201272.1AppointedArchbishop of Huế, Viet Nam
29 Oct 201676.3RetiredArchbishop of Huế, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for François Xavier Lê Văn Hồng
Archbishop François Xavier Lê Văn Hồng (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Huế

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTri Buu

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Huế.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 179, Number 14,849
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Aug 2012
  • r: Bollettino, 29 Oct 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.8, 28 Mar 2020; Data: 6 Apr 2020

Quantcast