Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Kontum

Dioecesis Kontumensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Luy Gonzaga Nguyn Hng Vi, Bishop
  • Michel Hoăng c Oanh, Bishop Emeritus
  • Pierre Trn Thanh Chung, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 24 November 1960
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Huế
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Viet Nam
  • Square Kilometers: 25,225 (9,743 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://giaophankontum.com/
  • Mailing Address: Toa Giam Muc, 146 rue Tran Hung Dao, Tx. Kontum, Viet Nam
  • Telephone: (090)9274.705

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Kontum
18 January 1932ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Quinhon Vicariate Apostolic of Kontum (erected)
24 November 1960Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Kontum
Vicariate Apostolic of Saigon
Diocese of Lạt (erected)
Diocese of Kontum
24 November 1960ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Kontum Diocese of Kontum
22 June 1967Territory LostDiocese of Lạt
Diocese of Kontum
Diocese of Ban M Thuột (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Kontum
195025,802700,0003.7%404064524ap1951
Diocese of Kontum
196980,627850,0009.5%761771,047610535ap1971
197968,745473,80014.5%324361,90917345ap1991
1999120,0001,200,00010.0%304343,529413352ap2000
2000180,0001,200,00015.0%274315,806413657ap2001
2001181,0631,300,00013.9%274315,840516357ap2002
2002193,2061,350,00014.3%294335,854517155ap2003
2003197,7231,400,00014.1%385434,5981819777ap2004
2004203,7231,418,88514.4%337405,0931319177ap2005
2006216,3841,438,39515.0%398474,60313120077ap2007
2013291,0631,775,20016.4%62411032,82510046594ap2014
2016318,8991,833,20017.4%79621412,26190521116ap2017

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_d, v3.2.2, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 21 Jul 2018

Quantcast