Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Matthew Burns, S.M.

Bishop of Menevia, Wales, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1944 Born
16 Dec 197127.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
24 May 200257.9AppointedBishop of Great Britain, Military
18 Jun 200258.0Ordained BishopBishop of Great Britain, Military
16 Oct 200864.3AppointedBishop of Menevia, Wales, Great Britain
1 Dec 200864.4InstalledBishop of Menevia, Wales, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Matthew Burns
Bishop Thomas Matthew Burns S.M. (born ) Bishop of Menevia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBelfast, County Antrim, Northern Ireland, Diocese of Down and Connor, Ireland
Ordained PriestSacred Heart and St. Teresa, Church, Paignton, Devon, Diocese of Plymouth, England
Ordained BishopSts. Michael and George, Cathedral, Aldershot, Hampshire, Military Ordinariate of Great Britain, Military

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Menevia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Oct 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Number 14,200
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 233, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • loc: CL, 25 Jan 2018
  • loc: CL, 20 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 8 Apr 2018