Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Richard Mulrooney

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Brooklyn, New York, USA

Titular Bishop of Valentiniana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1906Born
10 Jun 193024.4Ordained PriestPriest of Brooklyn, New York, USA
24 Feb 195953.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA
24 Feb 195953.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Valentiniana
22 Apr 195953.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Valentiniana
13 Jan 198175.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA
5 Aug 198983.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Brooklyn, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Charles Richard Mulrooney
Bishop Charles Richard Mulrooney (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Brooklyn

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrooklyn

  • a priest for 59.1 years
  • a bishop for 30.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast