Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Thomas Joseph Toolen

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mobile, Alabama

Titular Archbishop of Glastonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1886BornBaltimore
27 Sep 191024.5Ordained PriestPriest of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
28 Feb 192741.0AppointedBishop of Mobile, Alabama, USA
4 May 192741.1Ordained BishopBishop of Mobile, Alabama, USA
27 May 195468.2AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Mobile-Birmingham, Alabama, USA
29 Sep 196983.5RetiredBishop of Mobile, Alabama, USA
29 Sep 196983.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Glastonia
4 Dec 197690.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Mobile, Alabama, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas Joseph Toolen:
Archbishop Thomas Joseph Toolen (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mobile

  • a priest for 66.1 years
  • a bishop for 49.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1927, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015