Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Martin John Spalding

Deceased

Archbishop of Baltimore, Maryland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1810BornRolling Fork, KY
13 Aug 183424.2Ordained PriestPriest of Bardstown, Kentucky, USA
9 May 184838.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Louisville, Kentucky, USA
9 May 184838.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Lagania
10 Sep 184838.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lagania
11 Feb 185039.7SucceededBishop of Louisville, Kentucky, USA
6 May 186454.0AppointedArchbishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
31 Jul 186454.2InstalledArchbishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
7 Feb 187261.7DiedArchbishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA

MicroData Summary for Martin John Spalding:
Archbishop Martin John Spalding (born , died ) Archbishop of Baltimore

  • a priest for 37.5 years
  • a bishop for 23.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 139, and Page 337
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 353

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013