Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benjamin Joseph Keiley

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Savannah, Georgia, USA

Titular Bishop of Scilium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1847Born
31 Dec 187326.2Ordained PriestPriest of Wilmington, Delaware, USA
1886¹38.2IncardinatedPriest of Savannah, Georgia, USA
2 Apr 190052.4AppointedBishop of Savannah, Georgia, USA
3 Jun 190052.6Ordained BishopBishop of Savannah, Georgia, USA
18 Mar 192274.4RetiredBishop of Savannah, Georgia, USA
18 Mar 192274.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Scilium
17 Jun 192577.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Savannah, Georgia, USA

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Benjamin Joseph Keiley (VIAF: 8953352)
Bishop Benjamin Joseph Keiley (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Savannah

EventPlace
Birth PlacePetersburg, VA

  • a priest for 51.4 years
  • a bishop for 25.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 504

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018