Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Joseph McSorley, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Jolo

Titular Bishop of Sozusa in Palaestina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1913BornCollingswood, NJ, USA
30 May 193925.8Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
195440.4AppointedPrefect of Sulu, Philippines
12 Jul 195844.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Sozusa in Palaestina
12 Jul 195844.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Jolo, Philippines
8 Oct 195845.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sozusa in Palaestina
20 Nov 197057.2DiedVicar Apostolic of Jolo, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Francis Joseph McSorley:
Bishop Francis Joseph McSorley O.M.I. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Jolo

  • a priest for 31.5 years
  • a bishop for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013