Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicholas Grimley, S.M.A. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Cape Palmas

Titular Bishop of Thuburbo Minus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1917BornSkerries, Ireland
6 Feb 195436.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
7 May 196244.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Cape Palmas, Liberia
7 May 196244.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Thuburbo Minus
25 Jul 196244.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thuburbo Minus
30 Jul 197254.9ResignedVicar Apostolic of Cape Palmas, Liberia
9 Jun 199577.8DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Cape Palmas, Liberia

MicroData Summary for Nicholas Grimley:
Bishop Nicholas Grimley S.M.A. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Cape Palmas

  • a priest for 41.3 years
  • a bishop for 32.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 107

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013