Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Addis Emmet, S.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Giamaica o Jamaica, Jamaica

Titular Bishop of Tuscamia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Aug 1873BornBoston, MA, USA
15 Aug 189522.0ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
30 Jul 190935.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
3 Jul 193056.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Giamaica o Jamaica, Jamaica, Antilles
3 Jul 193056.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Tuscamia
21 Sep 193057.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tuscamia
8 Apr 194975.6RetiredVicar Apostolic of Giamaica o Jamaica, Jamaica, Antilles
5 Oct 195077.1DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Giamaica o Jamaica, Jamaica, Antilles

MicroData Summary for Thomas Addis Emmet:
Bishop Thomas Addis Emmet S.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Giamaica o Jamaica

  • a priest for 41.2 years
  • a bishop for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1930, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013