Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Savannah

Dioecesis Savannensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Gregory John Hartmayer, O.F.M. Conv., Bishop
  • John Kevin Boland, Bishop Emeritus
  • Raymond William Lessard, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Split: 2 July 1956
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Atlanta
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Georgia
  • Country: United States of America
  • Square Kilometers: 95,928 (37,038 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: XIV (FL, GA, NC, SC)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: SAV
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diosav.org/
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Pastoral Center, 601 East Liberty St., Savannah, GA 31401
  • Telephone: (912)201-4100
  • Fax: 201-4081

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Savannah
3 July 1850ErectedDiocese of Charleston
Diocese of Mobile
Diocese of Savannah (erected)
9 January 1857Territory LostDiocese of Savannah Vicariate Apostolic of Florida (erected)
Diocese of Savannah-Atlanta
5 January 1937Name ChangedDiocese of Savannah Diocese of Savannah-Atlanta
2 July 1956SplitDiocese of Savannah-Atlanta Diocese of Atlanta
Diocese of Savannah
Diocese of Savannah
2 July 1956SplitDiocese of Savannah-Atlanta Diocese of Atlanta
Diocese of Savannah
10 February 1962Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Savannah (From Baltimore to Atlanta)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Savannah-Atlanta
195030,9223,140,6201.0%389112923912229563ap1951
Diocese of Savannah
196633,3171,790,4631.9%3846843965221938ap1967
197034,9601,800,0001.9%71391103174723544ap1971
197638,0241,600,0002.4%6134954004721143ap1977
198049,5461,640,0003.0%6437101490184521045ap1981
199059,7302,347,2852.5%493988678355618149ap1991
199974,8002,465,2773.0%652893804371413053ap2000
200075,4002,500,0003.0%663096785344511952ap2001
200177,5002,500,0003.1%662995815324512751ap2002
200276,0002,610,4322.9%682694808483512053ap2003
200378,5332,630,0623.0%8625111707463811353ap2004
200475,9872,630,0622.9%71249579944359852ap2005
201084,5002,904,0002.9%822210481256268855ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 2 Apr 2014