Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mieczyslaw Jaworski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Kielce

Titular Bishop of Rapidum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jul 1930BornMorawica
17 Jun 195625.8Ordained PriestPriest of Kielce, Poland
7 May 198251.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kielce, Poland
7 May 198251.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Rapidum
6 Jun 198251.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rapidum
19 Aug 200171.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Kielce, Poland

MicroData Summary for Mieczyslaw Jaworski:
Bishop Mieczyslaw Jaworski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Kielce

  • a priest for 45.1 years
  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015