Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Octaviano Márquez y Tóriz

Deceased

Archbishop of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1904BornTlaxcala
31 Oct 192622.6Ordained PriestPriest of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla, México
14 Dec 195046.7AppointedArchbishop of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla, México
3 Feb 195146.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla, México
24 Sep 197571.5DiedArchbishop of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla, México

MicroData Summary for Octaviano Márquez y Tóriz:
Archbishop Octaviano Márquez y Tóriz (born , died ) Archbishop of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla

  • a priest for 48.9 years
  • a bishop for 24.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 16 Apr 2014