Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Emilio Abascal y Salmerón

Deceased

Archbishop of Jalapa (Xalapa), Veracruz, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1904Born
30 Oct 192723.3Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jul 195349.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla, México
25 Jul 195349.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Abziri
11 Oct 195349.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abziri
18 Apr 196863.8AppointedArchbishop of Jalapa (Xalapa), Veracruz, México
12 Mar 197974.7DiedArchbishop of Jalapa (Xalapa), Veracruz, México

MicroData Summary for Emilio Abascal y Salmerón
Archbishop Emilio Abascal y Salmerón (born , died ) Archbishop of Jalapa (Xalapa)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCórdoba

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 29 Jun 2018

Quantcast