Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bartolomé Carrasco Briseño

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Antequera, Oaxaca, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Aug 1918Born
31 Mar 194526.6Ordained PriestPriest of Puebla de los Ángeles, México
19 Aug 196345.0AppointedBishop of Huejutla, Hidalgo, México
17 Dec 196345.3Ordained BishopBishop of Huejutla, Hidalgo, México
18 May 196748.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
18 May 196748.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Claternae
11 Jun 197152.8AppointedBishop of Tapachula, Chiapas, México
17 Dec 197153.3InstalledBishop of Tapachula, Chiapas, México
11 Jun 197657.8AppointedArchbishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
17 Aug 197657.9InstalledArchbishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
4 Oct 199375.1RetiredArchbishop of Antequera, Oaxaca, México
7 Jan 199980.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Antequera, Oaxaca, México

MicroData Summary
Bartolomé Carrasco Briseño
Archbishop Bartolomé Carrasco Briseño
(born , died )
Archbishop Emeritus of Antequera, Oaxaca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTlaxco, Archdiocese of Puebla de los Ángeles
Ordained BishopHuejutla, Diocese of Huejutla, Hidalgo
Death PlaceOaxaca, Archdiocese of Antequera, Oaxaca

  • a priest for 53.7 years
  • a bishop for 35.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1963, Number 123
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025