Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Garcia Franco

Deceased

Bishop of Mazatlán, Sinaloa, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1909Born
25 Oct 193122.6Ordained PriestPriest
18 Dec 195849.7AppointedBishop of Mazatlán, Sinaloa, México
22 Feb 195949.9Ordained BishopBishop of Mazatlán, Sinaloa, México
8 Mar 198171.9DiedBishop of Mazatlán, Sinaloa, México

MicroData Summary for Miguel Garcia Franco
Bishop Miguel Garcia Franco (born , died ) Bishop of Mazatlán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTepehuanes

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 22.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast