Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Cabrera Cruz

Deceased

Bishop of San Luis Potosí


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1893BornLeón
24 Feb 191925.3Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 195057.1AppointedBishop of Papantla, Puebla, México
24 Feb 195157.3Ordained BishopBishop of Papantla, Puebla, México
25 Aug 195864.8AppointedBishop of San Luis Potosí, México
2 Sep 196773.8DiedBishop of San Luis Potosí, México

MicroData Summary for Luis Cabrera Cruz:
Bishop Luis Cabrera Cruz (born , died ) Bishop of San Luis Potosí

  • a priest for 48.5 years
  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015