Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Trinidad Medel Pérez

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Durango, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1928Born
15 Jan 195526.6Ordained PriestPriest of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla, México
22 May 198657.9AppointedBishop of Tula, Hidalgo, México
12 Jul 198658.1Ordained BishopBishop of Tula, Hidalgo, México
4 Mar 199364.7AppointedArchbishop of Durango, México
5 Jun 200274.0ResignedArchbishop of Durango, México
11 Sep 201789.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Durango, México

MicroData Summary for José Trinidad Medel Pérez
Archbishop José Trinidad Medel Pérez (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Durango

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Cruz Aquiáhuac
Death PlacePuebla, Archdiocese of Puebla de los Ángeles, Puebla

  • a priest for 62.6 years
  • a bishop for 31.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast