Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Dominique-Marie Jean Michel David, Comm. l'Emm.

Archbishop of Monaco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1963 Born
23 Jun 199026.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Nantes, France
29 Jun 199127.7Ordained PriestPriest of Nantes, France
21 Jan 202056.3AppointedArchbishop of Monaco
8 Mar 202056.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Monaco

MicroData Summary for Dominique-Marie Jean Michel David
Archbishop Dominique-Marie Jean Michel David Comm. l'Emm. (born ) Archbishop of Monaco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBeaupréau, Diocese of Angers, France
Ordained DeaconSaint-Pierre, Cathedral, Nantes, Diocese of Nantes, France
Ordained PriestSaint-Pierre, Cathedral, Nantes, Diocese of Nantes, France
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame-Immaculée, Cathedral, Monaco, Archdiocese of Monaco

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Monaco.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Jan 2020
  • ob: CB, 21 Jan 2020
  • c0+/od: AJ, 11 Feb 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast