Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierantonio Tremolada

Auxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}

Titular Bishop of Maxita


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1956 BornLissone
13 Jun 198124.7Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
24 May 201457.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
24 May 201457.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Maxita
28 Jun 201457.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maxita

MicroData Summary for Pierantonio Tremolada:
Bishop Pierantonio Tremolada (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 May 2014
  • ob/c2: CB, 24 May 2014
  • c34: CB, 28 Jun 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 29 Jun 2014