Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan-José Aguirre Muñoz, M.C.C.I.

Bishop of Bangassou, Central African Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1954 Born
13 Sep 198026.2Ordained PriestPriest of Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus
13 Dec 199743.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Bangassou, Central African Republic
10 May 199843.9Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Bangassou, Central African Republic
21 Dec 200046.5SucceededBishop of Bangassou, Central African Republic

MicroData Summary for Juan-José Aguirre Muñoz
Bishop Juan-José Aguirre Muñoz M.C.C.I. (born ) Bishop of Bangassou

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCórdoba, Spain

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bangassou.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,323

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast