Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Bangassou

Dioecesis Bangassuensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Juan-José Aguirre Muñoz, M.C.C.I., Bishop
  • Jesús Ruiz Molina, M.C.C.I., Auxiliary Bishop-Elect

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 10 February 1964
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Bangui
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Central African Republic
  • Square Kilometers: 134,284 (51,867 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Eveche, B.P. 84, Bangassou, Rep. Centrafricaine; c/o Maison Comboni, B.P. 1427, Bangui, Rep. Centraricaine

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Bangassou
14 June 1954ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Bangui Prefecture Apostolic of Bangassou (erected)
Diocese of Bangassou
10 February 1964ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Bangassou Diocese of Bangassou
18 December 2004Territory LostDiocese of Bangassou Diocese of Alindao (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Bangassou
197042,367354,00012.0%131321,323475720ap1971
198039,978337,00011.9%424281,427343312ap1981
199060,509367,00016.5%722292,086313021ap1991
199992,246350,50026.3%2217392,365173119ap2000
200094,100350,00026.9%1417313,035173119ap2001
200180,271420,00019.1%1213253,210153521ap2002
200282,100420,00019.5%1614302,736193021ap2003
200382,100420,00019.5%1513282,932162521ap2004
200485,899445,00019.3%1615312,770192621ap2005
200552,000191,50027.2%415192,7361198bul:18Dec2004
200653,300194,00027.5%1117281,903191712ap2007
201290,000214,00042.1%245293,103772511ap2013
201595,000226,00042.0%274313,06462311ap2016

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_d, v3.1.9, 15 Apr 2017; Data: 11 Jul 2017