Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Grau y Arola, C.M.F. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Quibdó

Titular Bishop of Pella


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1903BornSan Jaime de Viladrover, Spain
29 May 192623.3Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
24 Mar 195350.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Quibdó, Colombia
24 Mar 195350.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Pella
31 May 195350.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pella
6 Jun 198380.3RetiredVicar Apostolic of Quibdó, Colombia
4 Mar 200299.1DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Quibdó, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Pedro Grau y Arola:
Bishop Pedro Grau y Arola C.M.F. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Quibdó

  • a priest for 75.8 years
  • a bishop for 48.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013