Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Ignacio López Umaña

Deceased

Archbishop of Cartagena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1883BornAlpujarra
30 Nov 190724.0Ordained PriestPriest
10 Apr 192440.3AppointedBishop of Garzón, Colombia
3 Aug 192440.6Ordained BishopBishop of Garzón, Colombia
15 Mar 194258.3AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Cartagena, Colombia
15 Mar 194258.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Pelusium
13 Nov 194359.9SucceededArchbishop of Cartagena, Colombia
3 Oct 197490.8DiedArchbishop of Cartagena, Colombia

MicroData Summary for José Ignacio López Umaña:
Archbishop José Ignacio López Umaña (born , died ) Archbishop of Cartagena

  • a priest for 66.8 years
  • a bishop for 50.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1924, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013