Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Paolo Cardinal Giobbe

Deceased

Datary Emeritus of the Apostolic Datary

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Vallicella


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1880Born
4 Dec 190424.9Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
20 Mar 192545.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Colombia
30 Mar 192545.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Ptolemais in Thebaide
26 Apr 192545.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Ptolemais in Thebaide
13 Jun 193555.4AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Netherlands
15 Dec 195878.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Vallicella
15 Dec 195878.9Elevated to Cardinal
15 Dec 195878.9ResignedApostolic Internuncio to Netherlands
14 Nov 195979.8AppointedDatary of the Apostolic Datary
1 Jan 196887.9RetiredDatary of the Apostolic Datary
14 Aug 197292.5DiedDatary Emeritus of the Apostolic Datary

MicroData Summary for Paolo Giobbe (VIAF: 288623722)
Paolo Cardinal Giobbe (born , died ) Datary Emeritus of Apostolic Datary

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 67.6 years
  • a bishop for 47.3 years
  • a cardinal for 13.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1925, Number 22
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 99, and Page 188

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast