Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joaquín Bienvenido Alcaide y Bueso, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Goajira

Titular Bishop of Castoria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1879BornChilches, Spain
24 Sep 190424.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
15 Dec 193152.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Goajira, Colombia
15 Dec 193152.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Castoria
1 May 193252.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castoria
21 Feb 194363.2DiedVicar Apostolic of Goajira, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Joaquín Bienvenido Alcaide y Bueso:
Bishop Joaquín Bienvenido Alcaide y Bueso O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Goajira

  • a priest for 38.4 years
  • a bishop for 10.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015