Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Garzón

Dioecesis Garzonensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Split: 24 July 1972
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Ibagué
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Colombia
  • Square Kilometers: 9,667 (3,733 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesisgarzon.com/
  • Mailing Address: Obispado, Calle 6, N. 7-14, Garzon, Huila, Colombia
  • Telephone: (82)8332.194; 8332.438
  • Fax: 8332.439

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Garzón
20 May 1900ErectedDiocese of Tolima (suppressed) Diocese of Garzón (erected)
Diocese of Ibagué (erected)
Diocese of Garzón-Neiva
25 February 1964Name ChangedDiocese of Garzón Diocese of Garzón-Neiva
Diocese of Garzón
24 July 1972SplitDiocese of Garzón-Neiva Diocese of Garzón
Diocese of Neiva

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Garzón
1950239,800240,00099.9%6717842,8542713750ap1951
Diocese of Garzón-Neiva
1966379,420380,00099.8%7020904,2152821850ap1967
1970462,500474,32097.5%68686,80152ap1971
Diocese of Garzón
1976231,900232,04299.9%3910494,7321011627ap1977
1980285,750285,880100.0%3617535,3912011727ap1981
1990412,000421,00097.9%5012626,6451411834ap1991
1999514,000530,00097.0%5515707,3423015541ap2000
2000447,000461,00097.0%6515805,5873115544ap2001
2001447,000461,00097.0%7515904,9663615548ap2002
2002447,000461,00097.0%6615815,5183615549ap2003
2003475,000490,00096.9%85151004,7503415551ap2004
2004475,000490,00096.9%8110915,2193015551ap2005
2006488,000508,00096.1%106101164,2062915551ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.9, 27 Jan 2014; data: 2 Mar 2014