Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanisław Kostka Łukomski

Deceased

Bishop of Łomża, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1874Born
24 Feb 189823.3Ordained PriestPriest of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
8 Mar 192045.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
8 Mar 192045.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Sicca Veneria
23 May 192045.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sicca Veneria
24 Jun 192651.6AppointedBishop of Łomża, Poland
28 Oct 194874.0DiedBishop of Łomża, Poland

MicroData Summary for Stanisław Kostka Łukomski
Bishop Stanisław Kostka Łukomski (born , died ) Bishop of Łomża

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBorek

  • a priest for 50.6 years
  • a bishop for 28.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1949
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Number 12,902
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,815
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1920, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast