Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karol Mieczysław Radoński

Deceased

Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1883BornKocialkowa Górka
14 Feb 190925.4Ordained PriestPriest
8 Apr 192743.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Poznań, Poland
8 Apr 192743.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Berissa
29 May 192743.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Berissa
5 Apr 192945.5AppointedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
16 Mar 195167.4DiedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

MicroData Summary for Karol Mieczysław Radoński:
Bishop Karol Mieczysław Radoński (born , died ) Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

  • a priest for 42.1 years
  • a bishop for 23.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,870
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,816
  • ob/c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1927, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013