Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoni Laubitz

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań

Titular Bishop of Iasus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1861BornPakosc
11 Mar 188826.8Ordained PriestPriest of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
8 Nov 192463.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
8 Nov 192463.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Iasus
18 Jan 192563.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Iasus
17 May 193977.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland

MicroData Summary for Antoni Laubitz:
Bishop Antoni Laubitz (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Gniezno e Poznań

  • a priest for 51.2 years
  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • op/ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1925, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013