Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paweł Czesław Rydzewski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Łomża

Titular Bishop of Chusira


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1893BornRajgrod
10 Jun 191724.3Ordained PriestPriest
6 Dec 194653.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Łomża, Poland
6 Dec 194653.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Chusira
13 Apr 194754.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Chusira
22 Aug 195158.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Łomża, Poland

MicroData Summary for Paweł Czesław Rydzewski:
Bishop Paweł Czesław Rydzewski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Łomża

  • a priest for 34.1 years
  • a bishop for 4.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1951
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015