Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignacy Swirski

Deceased

Bishop of Siedlce, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1885Born
28 Oct 191328.1Ordained PriestPriest
12 Apr 194660.5AppointedBishop of Siedlce, Poland
30 Jun 194660.7Ordained BishopBishop of Siedlce, Poland
25 Mar 196882.5DiedBishop of Siedlce, Poland

MicroData Summary for Ignacy Swirski
Bishop Ignacy Swirski (born , died ) Bishop of Siedlce

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEllerno

  • a priest for 54.4 years
  • a bishop for 21.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast