Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanislaw Wojciech Okoniewski

Deceased

Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1870BornPopowo
23 Jun 189525.2Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 192454.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
14 Dec 192454.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Podalia
25 Apr 192656.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Podalia
4 Oct 192656.5SucceededBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland
1 May 194474.0DiedBishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm), Poland

MicroData Summary for Stanislaw Wojciech Okoniewski:
Bishop Stanislaw Wojciech Okoniewski (born , died ) Bishop of Chelmno (Culma, Kulm)

  • a priest for 48.9 years
  • a bishop for 18.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013