Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard Franciszek Dembek

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Łomża

Titular Bishop of Troas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1878BornBartodzieje
22 Mar 190324.9Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jul 193052.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Łomża, Poland
25 Jul 193052.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Troas
5 Oct 193052.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Troas
3 Jun 193759.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Łomża, Poland

MicroData Summary for Bernard Franciszek Dembek:
Bishop Bernard Franciszek Dembek (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Łomża

  • a priest for 34.1 years
  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1930, Number 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015