Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Petru Gherghel

Bishop of Iaşi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1940 BornGheraesti-Neamt
29 Jun 196525.0Ordained PriestPriest of Iaşi, Romania
14 Mar 199049.7AppointedBishop of Iaşi, Romania
1 May 199049.8Ordained BishopBishop of Iaşi, Romania

MicroData Summary for Petru Gherghel:
Bishop Petru Gherghel (born ) Bishop of Iaşi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Iaşi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,874
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122, Number 10,966
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013