Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Friedrich Ostermann

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Münster, Germany

Titular Bishop of Dolia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1932Born
11 Feb 195825.6Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
27 Jun 198149.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
27 Jun 198149.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Dolia
13 Sep 198149.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dolia
18 Jul 200775.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
22 Oct 201886.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Münster, Germany

MicroData Summary for Friedrich Ostermann (VIAF: 8259151837999720520005)
Bishop Friedrich Ostermann (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Münster

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMünster, Diocese of Münster
Death PlaceMünster, Diocese of Münster

  • a priest for 60.6 years
  • a bishop for 37.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Jul 2007
  • d: CB, 22 Oct 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 24 Oct 2018

Quantcast