Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Laurenz Böggering

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Münster

Titular Bishop of Mathara in Numidia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jan 1904BornLowick
23 Feb 192925.1Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
25 Jul 196763.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
25 Jul 196763.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Mathara in Numidia
24 Sep 196763.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mathara in Numidia
23 Feb 197975.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
10 Jan 199691.9DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Münster, Germany

MicroData Summary for Laurenz Böggering:
Bishop Laurenz Böggering (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Münster

  • a priest for 66.9 years
  • a bishop for 28.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 29 Nov 2013