Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Kamphaus

Bishop Emeritus of Limburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1932 BornLüdinghausen
21 Feb 195927.1Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
3 May 198250.3AppointedBishop of Limburg, Germany
13 Jun 198250.4Ordained BishopBishop of Limburg, Germany
2 Feb 200775.0RetiredBishop of Limburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Franz Kamphaus:
Bishop Franz Kamphaus (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Limburg

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Limburg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2007
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013