Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Werner Thissen

Archbishop Emeritus of Hamburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1938 BornKleve
29 Jun 196627.6Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
16 Apr 199960.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
16 Apr 199960.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Scampa
24 May 199960.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Scampa
22 Nov 200264.0AppointedArchbishop of Hamburg, Germany
25 Jan 200364.1InstalledArchbishop of Hamburg, Germany
21 Mar 201475.3RetiredArchbishop of Hamburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Werner Thissen:
Archbishop Werner Thissen (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Hamburg

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Hamburg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Number 13,562
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Mar 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 26 Mar 2014