Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guy Gérard Deroubaix

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Denis, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jun 1927Born
23 Dec 195023.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Lille, France
29 Jun 195124.0Ordained PriestPriest of Lille, France
2 Oct 197649.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Saint-Denis, France
21 Nov 197649.4Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Saint-Denis, France
1 Apr 197850.8SucceededBishop of Saint-Denis, France
8 Jan 199668.5DiedBishop of Saint-Denis, France

MicroData Summary for Guy Gérard Deroubaix (VIAF: 32102494)
Bishop Guy Gérard Deroubaix (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Denis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Madeleine-lès-Lille, Diocese of Lille
Ordained DeaconSt-Sulpice, Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained PriestNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopCathedral, Saint-Denis, Diocese of Saint-Denis
Death PlaceSaint-Denis, Diocese of Saint-Denis

  • a priest for 44.5 years
  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 7 Jul 2018

Quantcast