Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Hermil

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Viviers, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1917Born
5 Jul 194224.7Ordained PriestPriest of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon-Cluny), France
15 May 196345.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Autun (-Châlon-sur-Saône-Mâcon-Cluny), France
15 May 196345.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Marida
2 Jul 196345.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Marida
14 Dec 196548.2AppointedBishop of Viviers, France
15 Oct 199275.0RetiredBishop of Viviers, France
10 Mar 200688.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Viviers, France

MicroData Summary for Jean Hermil
Bishop Jean Hermil (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Viviers

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCharolles

  • a priest for 63.6 years
  • a bishop for 42.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast